05/28/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
05/15/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/07/2024 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/20/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
House | 04/19/2024 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |