Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1338 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 15, 2024
Fiscal Note April 23, 2024
Fiscal Note February 29, 2024
Bill February 26, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2024
Bill April 20, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2024

Amended

Bill May 8, 2024
Bill May 7, 2024