05/21/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
05/15/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/04/2024 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |