Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1346 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 15, 2024
Fiscal Note April 22, 2024
Fiscal Note March 14, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2024
Bill April 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2024

Amended

Bill April 30, 2024
Bill April 29, 2024