Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1360 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 30, 2024
Fiscal Note March 27, 2024
Fiscal Note March 18, 2024
Bill March 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill April 27, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2024

Amended

Bill May 4, 2024
Bill May 3, 2024