|
05/24/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/23/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2024
|
Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
|
|
|