Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1454 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 15, 2024
Fiscal Note April 18, 2024
Bill April 15, 2024

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2024
Bill April 30, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2024

Amended

Bill May 5, 2024