06/06/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
05/16/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/16/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/06/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/03/2024 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
House | 04/26/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education | ||
Senate | 04/26/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |