Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB078 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 12, 2024
Fiscal Note April 24, 2024
Fiscal Note February 2, 2024
Bill January 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2024
Bill April 25, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2024

Amended

Bill May 7, 2024
Bill May 6, 2024