Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB084 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 18, 2024
Fiscal Note May 4, 2024
Fiscal Note April 3, 2024
Fiscal Note January 26, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2024
Bill May 3, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2024

Amended

Bill May 8, 2024