|
05/20/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
|
|
|