Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB100 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 17, 2024
Fiscal Note April 9, 2024
Fiscal Note March 13, 2024
Fiscal Note March 4, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2024

Amended

Bill April 30, 2024