|
05/20/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
|
|
|