04/11/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
04/04/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 04/04/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing |