Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB138 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1+Second Regular Session
2+Seventy-fourth General Assembly
3+STATE OF COLORADO
4+REREVISED
5+This Version Includes All Amendments
6+Adopted in the Second House
7+LLS NO. 24-0863.01 Rebecca Bayetti x4348
18 SENATE BILL 24-138
2-BY SENATOR(S) Simpson, Exum, Pelton R., Priola, Will, Winter F.;
3-also REPRESENTATIVE(S) Martinez and Catlin, Clifford, Duran, Mauro,
4-Snyder.
9+Senate Committees House Committees
10+Local Government & Housing Transportation, Housing & Local Government
11+A BILL FOR AN ACT
512 C
6-ONCERNING THE MODIFICATION OF THE SALARY CATEGORIZATION OF
7-LOCALLY ELECTED OFFICERS IN SPECIFIED COUNTIES
8-.
9-
10-Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:
11-SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 30-2-102, amend
12-(1.5)(a)(II)(B), (1.5)(a)(III)(A), (1.5)(a)(III)(C), (1.5)(a)(IV)(A),
13-(1.5)(a)(IV)(C), (1.5)(a)(V)(A), and (1.5)(a)(V)(B); and repeal
14-(1.5)(a)(II)(C) as follows:
15-30-2-102. Categorization of counties for fixing salaries of county
16-officers - salary amounts - legislative declaration. (1.5) (a) For the
17-purpose of establishing the salaries of county officers whose terms of office
18-begin on or after January 1, 2016:
19-(II) (B) Category II-B counties consist of the county
20- COUNTIES of
21-F
22-REMONT AND Pitkin.
23-NOTE: This bill has been prepared for the signatures of the appropriate legislative
24-officers and the Governor. To determine whether the Governor has signed the bill
25-or taken other action on it, please consult the legislative status sheet, the legislative
26-history, or the Session Laws.
27-________
28-Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material added to existing law; dashes
29-through words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law and such material is not part of
30-the act. (C) Category II-C counties consist of the county of Fremont.
31-(III) (A) Category III-A counties consist of the counties of
13+ONCERNING THE MODIFICATION OF THE SALARY CATEGORIZATION OF101
14+LOCALLY ELECTED OFFICERS IN SPECIFIED COUNTIES .102
15+Bill Summary
16+(Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
17+not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
18+passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
19+applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
20+http://leg.colorado.gov
21+.)
22+Current law categorizes each county for purposes of establishing
23+the salaries of elected officers in the county. The statutory salary amounts
24+are adjusted every 2 years for inflation and take effect for terms
25+commencing after any change is made.
26+The bill modifies the categories of 3 counties which will result in
27+accompanying percentage increases in salary as follows:
28+HOUSE
29+3rd Reading Unamended
30+March 25, 2024
31+HOUSE
32+Amended 2nd Reading
33+March 22, 2024
34+SENATE
35+3rd Reading Unamended
36+February 22, 2024
37+SENATE
38+2nd Reading Unamended
39+February 21, 2024
40+SENATE SPONSORSHIP
41+Simpson, Pelton R., Will, Winter F.
42+HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
43+Martinez and Catlin, Clifford, Duran, Mauro, Snyder
44+Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
45+Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
46+Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. ! Elbert county changes from category IV-A to category
47+III-A (17.7% increase for commissioners, treasurers,
48+assessors, clerks, and full-time coroners; 14.1% increase
49+for sheriffs; 50.0% increase for surveyors; 49.8% increase
50+for part-time coroners);
51+! Rio Grande county changes from category IV-C to category
52+III-C (17.7% increase for commissioners, treasurers,
53+assessors, clerks, and full-time coroners; 14.1% increase
54+for sheriffs; 50.0% increase for surveyors; 49.8% increase
55+for part-time coroners); and
56+! Hinsdale county changes from category V-B to category
57+V-A (8.3% increase for commissioners, treasurers,
58+assessors, clerks, sheriffs, surveyors, and part-time
59+coroners).
60+Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
61+SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 30-2-102, amend2
62+(1.5)(a)(II)(B), (1.5)(a)(III)(A), (1.5)(a)(III)(C), (1.5)(a)(IV)(A),3
63+(1.5)(a)(IV)(C), (1.5)(a)(V)(A), and (1.5)(a)(V)(B); and repeal4
64+(1.5)(a)(II)(C) as follows:5
65+30-2-102. Categorization of counties for fixing salaries of6
66+county officers - salary amounts - legislative declaration. (1.5) (a) For7
67+the purpose of establishing the salaries of county officers whose terms of8
68+office begin on or after January 1, 2016:9
69+(II) (B) Category II-B counties consist of the county COUNTIES of10
70+FREMONT AND Pitkin.11
71+(C) Category II-C counties consist of the county of Fremont.12
72+(III) (A) Category III-A counties consist of the counties of13
3273 Archuleta, Chaffee, Clear Creek, Delta, E
33-LBERT, Gunnison, Moffat,
34-Montezuma, Montrose, Morgan, Ouray, Park, Rio Blanco, San Miguel, and
35-Teller;
36-(C) Category III-C counties consist of the counties of Las Animas,
37-R
38-IO GRANDE, and Otero;
39-(IV) (A) Category IV-A counties consist of the counties of Custer,
40-Elbert,
41- and Prowers;
42-(C) Category IV-C counties consist of the counties of Huerfano Rio
43-Grande, and Yuma;
44-(V) (A) Category V-A counties consist of the counties of Baca,
74+LBERT, Gunnison, Moffat,14
75+Montezuma, Montrose, Morgan, Ouray, Park, Rio Blanco, San Miguel,15
76+and Teller;16
77+(C) Category III-C counties consist of the counties of Las Animas,17 138-2- RIO GRANDE, and Otero;1
78+(IV) (A) Category IV-A counties consist of the counties of Custer,2
79+Elbert, and Prowers;3
80+(C) Category IV-C counties consist of the counties of Huerfano4
81+Rio Grande, and Yuma;5
82+(V) (A) Category V-A counties consist of the counties of Baca,6
4583 Conejos, Costilla, H
46-INSDALE, Lincoln, Mineral, Phillips, Saguache, and San
47-Juan;
84+INSDALE, Lincoln, Mineral, Phillips, Saguache, and7
85+San Juan;8
4886 (B) Category V-B counties consist of the counties
49- COUNTY of
50-Crowley; and Hinsdale
51-SECTION 2. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act
52-takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following the expiration of the
53-ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general assembly; except
54-that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V
55-of the state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this act
56-within such period, then the act, item, section, or part will not take effect
57-unless approved by the people at the general election to be held in
58-PAGE 2-SENATE BILL 24-138 November 2024 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the official
59-declaration of the vote thereon by the governor.
60-____________________________ ____________________________
61-Steve Fenberg Julie McCluskie
62-PRESIDENT OF SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
63-THE SENATE OF REPRESENTATIVES
64-____________________________ ____________________________
65-Cindi L. Markwell Robin Jones
66-SECRETARY OF CHIEF CLERK OF THE HOUSE
67-THE SENATE OF REPRESENTATIVES
68- APPROVED________________________________________
69- (Date and Time)
70- _________________________________________
71- Jared S. Polis
72- GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF COLORADO
73-PAGE 3-SENATE BILL 24-138
87+ COUNTY of9
88+Crowley; and Hinsdale10
89+SECTION 2. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act11
90+takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following the expiration of the12
91+ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general assembly; except13
92+that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V14
93+of the state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this15
94+act within such period, then the act, item, section, or part will not take16
95+effect unless approved by the people at the general election to be held in17
96+November 2024 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the18
97+official declaration of the vote thereon by the governor.19
98+138
99+-3-