Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB138 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 9, 2024
Fiscal Note February 14, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 28, 2024

Amended

Bill March 25, 2024
Bill March 22, 2024