LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB177
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado Senate Bill SB177
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2024 Regular Session
Colorado Senate Bill SB177
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
July 8, 2024
Fiscal Note
March 12, 2024
Bill
March 7, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 27, 2024
Compare
Bill
March 26, 2024
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 16, 2024
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 11, 2024
Compare
Bill
April 10, 2024
Compare