04/30/2010 | File Number 675 | |||
04/30/2010 | New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/30/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/30/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/29/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/10 5:00 PM | |||
04/27/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/21/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/12/2010 | File Number 480 | |||
04/12/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 329 | |||
04/05/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 10:00 AM | |||
03/22/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/15/2010 | Public Hearing 03/19 | |||
03/12/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |