04/06/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
03/30/2011 | File Number 284 | |||
03/30/2011 | House Calendar Number 181 | |||
03/30/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/30/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/24/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/14/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |||
02/23/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | |||
02/22/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/14/2011 | Vote to Draft |