Connecticut 2011 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05608 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 03/30/2011

                            General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 5608
January Session, 2011  *_____HB05608PH____031511____*

General Assembly

Substitute Bill No. 5608 

January Session, 2011

*_____HB05608PH____031511____*

AN ACT CONCERNING THE IMPLEMENTATION OF CULTURALLY AND LINGUISTICALLY APPROPRIATE STANDARDS IN HEALTH CARE SETTINGS. 

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2011) (a) As used in this section: "CLAS standards" means standards 4 to 7, inclusive, of the Culturally and Linguistically Appropriate Standards issued by the United States Department of Health and Human Services' Office of Minority Health mandating that language access services be provided by health care providers who are recipients of federal funds.

(b) On or before October 1, 2011, the Commission on Health Equity shall establish a collaborative committee consisting of representatives from various health care entities that shall monitor and ensure accountability in the adoption of CLAS standards by health care providers receiving federal funds in the state. The collaborative committee shall consist of the following members: The chairperson of the state Commission on Health Equity; the chairperson of the Connecticut Multi-Cultural Health Partnership; the Commissioner of Public Health; the Commissioner of Mental Health and Addiction Services; the Healthcare Advocate; the president of the Connecticut Hospital Association; the chief executive officer of the Community Health Center Association of Connecticut; the president of the board of directors for the Connecticut Center for Primary Care; the executive director of the Connecticut State Dental Association; the chairperson of the board of directors of the Mental Health Association of Connecticut; the president of the executive board of directors of the Medical Interpreting Association of Connecticut; the president of the board of directors of the Connecticut Nurses' Association; the president of the Connecticut Emergency Nurses Association; the chairperson of the state Commission on Pharmacy; and the chief executive officer of the Connecticut Association of Healthcare Facilities. Any member of the committee may appoint a designee to serve in the same capacity as the appointing member. The chairpersons of the Commission on Health Equity shall select a chairperson and a vice-chairperson of the collaborative committee from among the committee membership. On or before January 1, 2012, the chairperson of the collaborative committee shall convene the initial meeting of the committee. The committee shall meet quarterly thereafter or more often as needed at the call of the chairperson.

(c) The collaborative committee shall: (1) Prepare quarterly reports concerning the adoption of, and compliance with, CLAS standards by health care providers in the state; (2) conduct an analysis of the number of individuals with limited English proficiency served in health care settings and the methods used in such settings to ensure compliance with CLAS standards; (3) establish a self-monitoring board that ensures culturally competent health care access throughout the state; (4) conduct train-the-trainer workshops on best practices in implementing and complying with CLAS standards; and (5) annually report to the General Assembly on its findings, including a report on the challenges of implementing the language access services mandated by CLAS standards. In carrying out the duties prescribed in this subsection, the collaborative committee shall seek advice and input from individuals and entities that are representative of the broad spectrum of health care providers in the state.

(d) On or before January 1, 2013, and annually thereafter until January 1, 2018, the collaborative committee shall report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, on its activities to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public health, human services and insurance and real estate. The collaborative committee shall terminate on January 1, 2018.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2011 New section

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2011

New section

 

PH Joint Favorable Subst.

PH

Joint Favorable Subst.