Connecticut 2011 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05608 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 5608
2-January Session, 2011 *_____HB05608PH____031511____*
1+General Assembly Committee Bill No. 5608
2+January Session, 2011 LCO No. 3816
3+ *03816HB05608PH_*
4+Referred to Committee on Public Health
5+Introduced by:
6+(PH)
37
48 General Assembly
59
6-Substitute Bill No. 5608
10+Committee Bill No. 5608
711
812 January Session, 2011
913
10-*_____HB05608PH____031511____*
14+LCO No. 3816
15+
16+*03816HB05608PH_*
17+
18+Referred to Committee on Public Health
19+
20+Introduced by:
21+
22+(PH)
1123
1224 AN ACT CONCERNING THE IMPLEMENTATION OF CULTURALLY AND LINGUISTICALLY APPROPRIATE STANDARDS IN HEALTH CARE SETTINGS.
1325
1426 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
1527
1628 Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2011) (a) As used in this section: "CLAS standards" means standards 4 to 7, inclusive, of the Culturally and Linguistically Appropriate Standards issued by the United States Department of Health and Human Services' Office of Minority Health mandating that language access services be provided by health care providers who are recipients of federal funds.
1729
18-(b) On or before October 1, 2011, the Commission on Health Equity shall establish a collaborative committee consisting of representatives from various health care entities that shall monitor and ensure accountability in the adoption of CLAS standards by health care providers receiving federal funds in the state. The collaborative committee shall consist of the following members: The chairperson of the state Commission on Health Equity; the chairperson of the Connecticut Multi-Cultural Health Partnership; the Commissioner of Public Health; the Commissioner of Mental Health and Addiction Services; the Healthcare Advocate; the president of the Connecticut Hospital Association; the chief executive officer of the Community Health Center Association of Connecticut; the president of the board of directors for the Connecticut Center for Primary Care; the executive director of the Connecticut State Dental Association; the chairperson of the board of directors of the Mental Health Association of Connecticut; the president of the executive board of directors of the Medical Interpreting Association of Connecticut; the president of the board of directors of the Connecticut Nurses' Association; the president of the Connecticut Emergency Nurses Association; the chairperson of the state Commission on Pharmacy; and the chief executive officer of the Connecticut Association of Healthcare Facilities. Any member of the committee may appoint a designee to serve in the same capacity as the appointing member. The chairpersons of the Commission on Health Equity shall select a chairperson and a vice-chairperson of the collaborative committee from among the committee membership. On or before January 1, 2012, the chairperson of the collaborative committee shall convene the initial meeting of the committee. The committee shall meet quarterly thereafter or more often as needed at the call of the chairperson.
30+(b) On or before October 1, 2011, the Commission on Health Equity shall establish a comprehensive collaborative committee consisting of representatives from various health care entities that shall monitor and ensure accountability in the adoption of CLAS standards by health care providers receiving federal funds in the state. The collaborative committee shall consist of not less than fifteen, nor more than twenty members who shall be appointed to serve on the collaborative committee based on recommendations from the Commission on Health Equity, the Connecticut Multicultural Health Partnership and the Department of Public Health. The chairpersons of the Commission on Health Equity shall select the chairpersons of the collaborative committee from among the committee membership. On or before January 1, 2012, the chairpersons of the collaborative committee shall schedule the initial meeting of the committee. The committee shall meet quarterly thereafter or more often as needed at the call of the chairpersons.
1931
2032 (c) The collaborative committee shall: (1) Prepare quarterly reports concerning the adoption of, and compliance with, CLAS standards by health care providers in the state; (2) conduct an analysis of the number of individuals with limited English proficiency served in health care settings and the methods used in such settings to ensure compliance with CLAS standards; (3) establish a self-monitoring board that ensures culturally competent health care access throughout the state; (4) conduct train-the-trainer workshops on best practices in implementing and complying with CLAS standards; and (5) annually report to the General Assembly on its findings, including a report on the challenges of implementing the language access services mandated by CLAS standards. In carrying out the duties prescribed in this subsection, the collaborative committee shall seek advice and input from individuals and entities that are representative of the broad spectrum of health care providers in the state.
2133
2234 (d) On or before January 1, 2013, and annually thereafter until January 1, 2018, the collaborative committee shall report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, on its activities to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public health, human services and insurance and real estate. The collaborative committee shall terminate on January 1, 2018.
2335
2436
2537
2638
2739 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
2840 Section 1 July 1, 2011 New section
2941
3042 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3143
3244 Section 1
3345
3446 July 1, 2011
3547
3648 New section
3749
50+Statement of Purpose:
51+
52+To establish a collaborative committee that will be charged with monitoring the implementation of, and compliance with, standards 4 to 7, inclusive, of the Culturally and Linguistically Appropriate Standards issued by the United States Department of Health and Human Services' Office of Minority Health.
53+
54+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]
3855
3956
40-PH Joint Favorable Subst.
4157
42-PH
58+Co-Sponsors: REP. KIRKLEY-BEY, 5th Dist.
4359
44-Joint Favorable Subst.
60+Co-Sponsors:
61+
62+REP. KIRKLEY-BEY, 5th Dist.
63+
64+H.B. 5608