Connecticut 2011 2011 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05608 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/22/2011

                    General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 5608
January Session, 2011  LCO No. 3816
 *03816HB05608PH_*
Referred to Committee on Public Health
Introduced by:
(PH)

General Assembly

Committee Bill No. 5608 

January Session, 2011

LCO No. 3816

*03816HB05608PH_*

Referred to Committee on Public Health 

Introduced by:

(PH)

AN ACT CONCERNING THE IMPLEMENTATION OF CULTURALLY AND LINGUISTICALLY APPROPRIATE STANDARDS IN HEALTH CARE SETTINGS.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2011) (a) As used in this section: "CLAS standards" means standards 4 to 7, inclusive, of the Culturally and Linguistically Appropriate Standards issued by the United States Department of Health and Human Services' Office of Minority Health mandating that language access services be provided by health care providers who are recipients of federal funds.

(b) On or before October 1, 2011, the Commission on Health Equity shall establish a comprehensive collaborative committee consisting of representatives from various health care entities that shall monitor and ensure accountability in the adoption of CLAS standards by health care providers receiving federal funds in the state. The collaborative committee shall consist of not less than fifteen, nor more than twenty members who shall be appointed to serve on the collaborative committee based on recommendations from the Commission on Health Equity, the Connecticut Multicultural Health Partnership and the Department of Public Health. The chairpersons of the Commission on Health Equity shall select the chairpersons of the collaborative committee from among the committee membership. On or before January 1, 2012, the chairpersons of the collaborative committee shall schedule the initial meeting of the committee. The committee shall meet quarterly thereafter or more often as needed at the call of the chairpersons. 

(c) The collaborative committee shall: (1) Prepare quarterly reports concerning the adoption of, and compliance with, CLAS standards by health care providers in the state; (2) conduct an analysis of the number of individuals with limited English proficiency served in health care settings and the methods used in such settings to ensure compliance with CLAS standards; (3) establish a self-monitoring board that ensures culturally competent health care access throughout the state; (4) conduct train-the-trainer workshops on best practices in implementing and complying with CLAS standards; and (5) annually report to the General Assembly on its findings, including a report on the challenges of implementing the language access services mandated by CLAS standards. In carrying out the duties prescribed in this subsection, the collaborative committee shall seek advice and input from individuals and entities that are representative of the broad spectrum of health care providers in the state.

(d) On or before January 1, 2013, and annually thereafter until January 1, 2018, the collaborative committee shall report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, on its activities to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public health, human services and insurance and real estate. The collaborative committee shall terminate on January 1, 2018. 

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2011 New section

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2011

New section

Statement of Purpose: 

To establish a collaborative committee that will be charged with monitoring the implementation of, and compliance with, standards 4 to 7, inclusive, of the Culturally and Linguistically Appropriate Standards issued by the United States Department of Health and Human Services' Office of Minority Health. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]

 

Co-Sponsors: REP. KIRKLEY-BEY, 5th Dist.

Co-Sponsors: 

REP. KIRKLEY-BEY, 5th Dist. 

H.B. 5608