04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/18/2011 | File Number 574 | |||
04/18/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 348 | |||
04/18/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/18/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/11/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/31/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/30/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/17/2011 | Public Hearing 03/21 | |||
03/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |