04/10/2012 | File Number 325 | |||
04/10/2012 | House Calendar Number 266 | |||
04/10/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/10/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/02/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/23/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/16/2012 | Public Hearing 03/20 | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |