House
|
06/18/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Public Act 13-133
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
File Number 843
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 637
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6006
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
File Number 460
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
House Calendar Number 296
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/19
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2013
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|