Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06292 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2013

Chaptered

Bill June 4, 2013

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2013
Bill April 11, 2013
Bill February 25, 2013