Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06292 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-House Bill No. 6292
1+General Assembly Committee Bill No. 6292
2+January Session, 2013 LCO No. 3641
3+ *_____HB06292APP___051613____*
4+Referred to Committee on HIGHER EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT ADVANCEMENT
5+Introduced by:
6+(HED)
27
3-Public Act No. 13-133
8+General Assembly
9+
10+Committee Bill No. 6292
11+
12+January Session, 2013
13+
14+LCO No. 3641
15+
16+*_____HB06292APP___051613____*
17+
18+Referred to Committee on HIGHER EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT ADVANCEMENT
19+
20+Introduced by:
21+
22+(HED)
423
524 AN ACT CONCERNING TEACHER EDUCATION PROGRAMS.
625
726 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
827
928 Section 1. Section 10-145a of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2013):
1029
1130 (a) The State Board of Education may, in accordance with section 10-19 and such regulations and qualifications as it prescribes, issue certificates of qualification to teach, to administer, to supervise or to serve in other positions requiring certification pursuant to regulations adopted by the State Board of Education in any public school in the state and may revoke the same. Any such regulations shall provide that the qualifications to maintain any administrator, supervisor or special service certificate shall incorporate the professional development provisions of section 10-148a. The certificates of qualification issued under this section shall be accepted by boards of education in lieu of any other certificate, provided additional qualifications may be required by a board of education, in which case the state certificate shall be accepted for such subjects as it includes.
1231
1332 (b) Any candidate in a program of teacher preparation leading to professional certification shall be encouraged to successfully complete an intergroup relations component of such a program which shall be developed with the participation of both sexes, and persons of various ethnic, cultural and economic backgrounds. Such intergroup relations program shall have the following objectives: (1) The imparting of an appreciation of the contributions to American civilization of the various ethnic, cultural and economic groups composing American society and an understanding of the life styles of such groups; (2) the counteracting of biases, discrimination and prejudices; and (3) the assurance of respect for human diversity and personal rights. The State Board of Education, the Board of Regents for Higher Education, the Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities and the Permanent Commission on the Status of Women shall establish a joint committee composed of members of the four agencies, which shall develop and implement such programs in intergroup relations.
1433
1534 (c) Any candidate in a program of teacher preparation leading to professional certification shall be encouraged to complete a (1) health component of such a program, which includes, but need not be limited to, human growth and development, nutrition, first aid, disease prevention and community and consumer health, and (2) mental health component of such a program, which includes, but need not be limited to, youth suicide, child abuse and alcohol and drug abuse.
1635
1736 (d) Any candidate in a program of teacher preparation leading to professional certification shall complete a school violence, bullying, as defined in section 10-222d, and suicide prevention and conflict resolution component of such a program.
1837
1938 (e) On and after July 1, 1998, any candidate in a program of teacher preparation leading to professional certification shall complete a computer and other information technology skills component of such program, as applied to student learning and classroom instruction, communications and data management.
2039
2140 (f) On and after July 1, 2006, any program of teacher preparation leading to professional certification shall include, as part of the curriculum, instruction in literacy skills and processes that reflects current research and best practices in the field of literacy training. Such instruction shall be incorporated into requirements of student major and concentration.
2241
2342 (g) On and after July 1, 2006, any program of teacher preparation leading to professional certification shall include, as part of the curriculum, instruction in the concepts of second language learning and second language acquisition and processes that reflects current research and best practices in the field of second language learning and second language acquisition. Such instruction shall be incorporated into requirements of student major and concentration.
2443
2544 (h) On and after July 1, 2011, any program of teacher preparation leading to professional certification may permit teaching experience in a nonpublic school, approved by the State Board of Education, and offered through a public or private institution of higher education to count towards the preparation and eligibility requirements for an initial educator certificate, provided such teaching experience is completed as part of a cooperating teacher program, in accordance with the provisions of subsection (d) of section 10-220a.
2645
27-(i) On and after July 1, 2012, any candidate entering a program of teacher preparation leading to professional certification shall be required to complete training in competency areas contained in the professional teaching standards established by the State Board of Education, including, but not limited to, development and characteristics of learners, evidence-based and standards-based instruction, evidence-based classroom and behavior management, [and] assessment and professional behaviors and responsibilities, and social and emotional development and learning of children. The training in social and emotional development and learning of children shall include instruction concerning a comprehensive, coordinated social and emotional assessment and early intervention for children displaying behaviors associated with social or emotional problems, the availability of treatment services for such children and referring such children for assessment, intervention or treatment services.
46+(i) On and after July 1, 2012, any candidate entering a program of teacher preparation leading to professional certification shall be required to complete training in competency areas contained in the professional teaching standards established by the State Board of Education, including, but not limited to, development and characteristics of learners, evidence-based and standards-based instruction, evidence-based classroom and behavior management, [and] assessment and professional behaviors and responsibilities, and social and emotional development and learning of children. The training in social and emotional development and learning of children shall include instruction in the provision of a comprehensive, coordinated social and emotional assessment and early intervention for children displaying behaviors associated with social or emotional problems and the availability of and a child's eligibility for treatment services.
2847
2948 (j) On and after July 1, 2015, any program of teacher preparation leading to professional certification shall require, as part of the curriculum, clinical experience, field experience or student teaching experience in a classroom during four semesters of such program of teacher preparation.
3049
3150 (k) On and after July 1, 2012, any program of teacher preparation leading to professional certification shall include, as part of the curriculum, instruction in the implementation of student individualized education programs as it relates to the provision of special education and related services.
51+
52+
53+
54+
55+This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
56+Section 1 July 1, 2013 10-145a
57+
58+This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
59+
60+Section 1
61+
62+July 1, 2013
63+
64+10-145a
65+
66+
67+
68+HED Joint Favorable
69+APP Joint Favorable
70+
71+HED
72+
73+Joint Favorable
74+
75+APP
76+
77+Joint Favorable