Connecticut 2018 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05588

Introduced
3/28/18  
Refer
3/28/18  
Refer
3/28/18  
Report Pass
4/5/18  
Report Pass
4/5/18  
Refer
4/9/18  
Report Pass
4/10/18  
Refer
4/13/18  
Refer
4/24/18  
Refer
4/24/18  
Report Pass
5/1/18  

Caption

An Act Adjusting The State Budget For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2019.

Impact

The legislation's passage directly impacts several state programs by adjusting their fiscal resources, which can lead to increased efficiency in spending and program execution. The reported appropriations place significant emphasis on health services and education, with specific mentions of subsidies for the University of Connecticut Health Center and other academic institutions. The reductions and reallocations signify a strategic approach to addressing the financial challenges facing these departments, indicating a potential shift in how financial support is distributed throughout the state apparatus.

Summary

House Bill 05588, titled 'An Act Adjusting The State Budget For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2019', is a financial management piece of legislation designed to amend the appropriated amounts for various agencies within the state for the specified fiscal year. The bill involves adjustments to general fund allocations, allowing for better management of state resources in light of expected financial constraints and necessities. The bill aims to ensure that adequate funding is directed toward critical services, especially in education and health, while also instituting necessary cuts to manage expenditures effectively.

Sentiment

The sentiment around HB 05588 appears mixed. Proponents view it as a necessary step in adapting to budgetary realities, emphasizing the importance of fiscal responsibility and the need for strategic adjustments in the face of financial instability. Critics, however, voice concerns regarding cuts to essential services, particularly those that affect vulnerable populations, which could arise due to the reallocations prescribed in the bill. Thus, while it is seen as a vital measure for long-term fiscal health, there are worries about its immediate impact on critical state services.

Contention

Debate surrounding the bill focuses on the balance between fiscal discipline and the need for funding essential services. The adjustments proposed, which include budget cuts and reallocations, have drawn opposition from various advocacy groups that fear these changes may prioritize budget health over community needs. The contention illustrates the overarching theme of governmental responsibility—how to support various state departments without undermining crucial services, a balancing act that will likely continue to evolve as fiscal landscapes shift.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

CT HB05035

An Act Adjusting The State Budget For The Biennium Ending June 30, 2019.

CT HB07027

An Act Concerning The State Budget For The Biennium Ending June Thirtieth 2019, And Making Appropriations Therefor.

CT HB06824

An Act Concerning The State Budget For The Biennium Ending June Thirtieth 2017, And Making Appropriations Therefor And Other Provisions Related To Revenue.

CT HB06350

An Act Concerning The Budget For The Biennium Ending June 30, 2015, And Other Provisions Relating To Revenue.

CT HB05005

An Act Adjusting The State Budget For The Biennium Ending June 30, 2021.

CT HB05044

An Act Making Adjustments To State Expenditures For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2017.

CT HB05596

An Act Making Adjustments To State Expenditures And Revenues For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2015.

CT HB05048

An Act Adjusting The State Budget For The Biennium Ending June 30, 2025.