House | 05/01/2018 | File Number 660 | ||
House | 05/01/2018 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/01/2018 | Favorable Report, House Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/01/2018 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/01/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/24/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/18 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/20/2018 | House Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/20/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/13/2018 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/10/2018 | File Number 383 | ||
House | 04/10/2018 | House Calendar Number 257 | ||
House | 04/10/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/09/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/05/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/29/2018 | Public Hearing 04/02 | ||
House | 03/28/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |