House | 02/06/2019 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 02/06/2019 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 02/05/2019 | Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 02/01/2019 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | ||
House | 02/01/2019 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | ||
House | 01/31/2019 | Change of Reference Human Services | ||
House | 01/17/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |