House | 05/10/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | File Number 677 | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | House Calendar Number 413 | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/07/2019 | Public Hearing 02/11 | ||
House | 02/06/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |