House
|
06/28/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2019
|
Public Act 19-106
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
File Number 815
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 423
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7432
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
File Number 116
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
House Calendar Number 94
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2019
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/14
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2019
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|