House | 05/16/2019 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | No New File by Committee on Education | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Education | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | File Number 201 | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | House Calendar Number 151 | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/22/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 02/27/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |