House | 04/17/2019 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | File Number 354 | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | House Calendar Number 232 | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 02/28/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |