21 | | - | (a) [On or before January 1, 2016,] Notwithstanding any provision of 3 |
---|
22 | | - | the general statutes, the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental 4 |
---|
23 | | - | Protection, in consultation with the Materials Innovation and 5 |
---|
24 | | - | Recycling Authority, shall issue a request for proposals from providers 6 |
---|
25 | | - | of solid waste materials management services, including, but not 7 |
---|
26 | | - | limited to, recycling, reuse, energy and fuel recovery for the purpose of 8 |
---|
27 | | - | redeveloping the Connecticut Solid Waste System Project. Such 9 |
---|
28 | | - | proposals shall not include the provision of waste collection or 10 |
---|
29 | | - | transportation services. From such proposals, the commissioner may 11 |
---|
30 | | - | select not more than three respondents who may each conduct a 12 |
---|
31 | | - | feasibility study with the cooperation of the Materials Innovation and 13 |
---|
32 | | - | Recycling Authority. Any such feasibility study shall be completed not 14 |
---|
33 | | - | later than January 1, 2017, and any such respondent shall submit a 15 |
---|
34 | | - | final proposal to the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental 16 |
---|
35 | | - | Protection not later than July 1, 2017. The commissioner shall provide 17 |
---|
36 | | - | an opportunity for public review and comment on such feasibility 18 |
---|
37 | | - | study. On or before September 15, 2017, the commissioner shall submit 19 Substitute Bill No. 7293 |
---|
| 26 | + | On or before January 1, 2016, the Commissioner of Energy and 3 |
---|
| 27 | + | Environmental Protection, in consultation with the Materials 4 |
---|
| 28 | + | Innovation and Recycling Authority, shall issue a request for proposals 5 |
---|
| 29 | + | from providers of solid waste materials management services, 6 |
---|
| 30 | + | including, but not limited to, recycling, reuse, energy and fuel recovery 7 |
---|
| 31 | + | for the purpose of redeveloping the Connecticut Solid Waste System 8 |
---|
| 32 | + | Project. Such proposals shall not include the provision of waste 9 |
---|
| 33 | + | collection or transportation services. From such proposals, the 10 |
---|
| 34 | + | commissioner may select not more than three respondents who may 11 |
---|
| 35 | + | each conduct a feasibility study with the cooperation of the Materials 12 |
---|
| 36 | + | Innovation and Recycling Authority. Any such feasibility study shall 13 |
---|
| 37 | + | be completed not later than January 1, 2017, and any such respondent 14 |
---|
| 38 | + | shall submit a final proposal to the Commissioner of Energy and 15 Raised Bill No. 7293 |
---|
44 | | - | a report on the nature and status of such proposals to the joint 20 |
---|
45 | | - | standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of 21 |
---|
46 | | - | matters relating to the environment and energy and technology and to 22 |
---|
47 | | - | the joint standing committee on legislative management. The joint 23 |
---|
48 | | - | standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of 24 |
---|
49 | | - | matters relating to the environment and energy and technology may 25 |
---|
50 | | - | hold a joint public hearing on such report not later than thirty days 26 |
---|
51 | | - | after receipt of such report. The commissioner, or the commissioner's 27 |
---|
52 | | - | designee, shall testify at any such public hearing and receive 28 |
---|
53 | | - | comments from the members of said committees concerning such 29 |
---|
54 | | - | proposals. [On or before December 31, 2017, the] Notwithstanding any 30 |
---|
55 | | - | other provision of the general statutes, the Commissioner of Energy 31 |
---|
56 | | - | and Environmental Protection may select one such final proposal and 32 |
---|
57 | | - | direct the Materials Innovation and Recycling Authority to enter into 33 |
---|
58 | | - | an agreement with the applicable respondent for the redevelopment of 34 |
---|
| 42 | + | LCO No. 4814 2 of 3 |
---|
| 43 | + | |
---|
| 44 | + | Environmental Protection not later than July 1, 2017. The 16 |
---|
| 45 | + | commissioner shall provide an opportunity for public review and 17 |
---|
| 46 | + | comment on such feasibility study. On or before September 15, 2017, 18 |
---|
| 47 | + | the commissioner shall submit a report on the nature and status of 19 |
---|
| 48 | + | such proposals to the joint standing committees of the General 20 |
---|
| 49 | + | Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to the environment 21 |
---|
| 50 | + | and energy and technology and to the joint standing committee on 22 |
---|
| 51 | + | legislative management. The joint standing committees of the General 23 |
---|
| 52 | + | Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to the environment 24 |
---|
| 53 | + | and energy and technology may hold a joint public hearing on such 25 |
---|
| 54 | + | report not later than thirty days after receipt of such report. The 26 |
---|
| 55 | + | commissioner, or the commissioner's designee, shall testify at any such 27 |
---|
| 56 | + | public hearing and receive comments from the members of said 28 |
---|
| 57 | + | committees concerning such proposals. [On or before December 31, 29 |
---|
| 58 | + | 2017, the] Notwithstanding any other provision of the general statutes, 30 |
---|
| 59 | + | the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection may select 31 |
---|
| 60 | + | one such final proposal and [direct] order, pursuant to section 22a-208, 32 |
---|
| 61 | + | the Materials Innovation and Recycling Authority to enter into an 33 |
---|
| 62 | + | agreement with the applicable respondent for the redevelopment of 34 |
---|
59 | 63 | | the Connecticut Solid Waste Management System Project. In selecting 35 |
---|
60 | 64 | | such final proposal, the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental 36 |
---|
61 | 65 | | Protection shall consider the following factors: (1) Whether the 37 |
---|
62 | 66 | | proposal is consistent with the strategies developed pursuant to 38 |
---|
63 | 67 | | section 22a-241a, (2) whether the proposal is consistent with the goals 39 |
---|
64 | 68 | | of the state-wide solid waste management plan adopted in accordance 40 |
---|
65 | 69 | | with section 22a-228, (3) whether the proposal is in the best interest of 41 |
---|
66 | 70 | | the municipalities under contract with the Materials Innovation and 42 |
---|
67 | 71 | | Recycling Authority, including, but not limited to, the maintenance or 43 |
---|
68 | 72 | | reduction of current tipping fees for contracted waste, (4) the level of 44 |
---|
69 | 73 | | investment proposed by the respondent, (5) any potential positive 45 |
---|
70 | 74 | | impacts on the state's economic development, (6) public comments 46 |
---|
71 | 75 | | received on the feasibility studies, and (7) any other factor consistent 47 |
---|
72 | 76 | | with the purpose of this section that the Commissioner of Energy and 48 |
---|
73 | 77 | | Environmental Protection deems relevant to the redevelopment of the 49 |
---|
78 | | - | Materials Innovation and Recycling Authority's ability to obligate 54 Substitute Bill No. 7293 |
---|
79 | | - | |
---|
80 | | - | |
---|
81 | | - | LCO {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07293- |
---|
82 | | - | R01-HB.docx } |
---|
83 | | - | 3 of 3 |
---|
84 | | - | |
---|
85 | | - | municipal customers to remain under contract or to enter into any 55 |
---|
86 | | - | contract with the applicable respondent. 56 |
---|
87 | | - | (b) Not later than May 15, 2019, the Materials Innovation and 57 |
---|
88 | | - | Recycling Authority shall submit the terms of a preliminary agreement 58 |
---|
89 | | - | with the applicable respondent that was negotiated in accordance with 59 |
---|
90 | | - | subsection (a) of this section to the joint standing committee of the 60 |
---|
91 | | - | General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to the 61 |
---|
92 | | - | environment, the Governor, the Commissioner of Energy and 62 |
---|
93 | | - | Environmental Protection and each municipality served by the 63 |
---|
94 | | - | Connecticut Solid Waste System Project. Such terms shall be posted on 64 |
---|
95 | | - | the Internet web site of the authority. The commissioner and the 65 |
---|
96 | | - | authority shall consult with such municipalities concerning the terms 66 |
---|
97 | | - | of such preliminary agreement, including, but not limited to, any 67 |
---|
98 | | - | service fees and contract terms that may be applicable to such 68 |
---|
99 | | - | municipalities. 69 |
---|
| 87 | + | Materials Innovation and Recycling Authority's ability to obligate 54 |
---|
| 88 | + | municipal customers to remain under contract. 55 |
---|