Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB07293 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/11/2019

                             
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07293-R01-
HB.docx  
1 of 3 
 
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 7293  
January Session, 2019 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E REDEVELOPMENT OF C ERTAIN SOLID 
WASTE MANAGEMENT FAC ILITIES.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 22a-268g of the general statutes is repealed and 1 
the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): 2 
(a) [On or before January 1, 2016,] Notwithstanding any provision of 3 
the general statutes, the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental 4 
Protection, in consultation with the Materials Innovation and 5 
Recycling Authority, shall issue a request for proposals from providers 6 
of solid waste materials management services, including, but not 7 
limited to, recycling, reuse, energy and fuel recovery for the purpose of 8 
redeveloping the Connecticut Solid Waste System Project. Such 9 
proposals shall not include the provision of waste collection or 10 
transportation services. From such proposals, the commissioner may 11 
select not more than three respondents who may each conduct a 12 
feasibility study with the cooperation of the Materials Innovation and 13 
Recycling Authority. Any such feasibility study shall be completed not 14 
later than January 1, 2017, and any such respondent shall submit a 15 
final proposal to the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental 16 
Protection not later than July 1, 2017. The commissioner shall provide 17 
an opportunity for public review and comment on such feasibility 18 
study. On or before September 15, 2017, the commissioner shall submit 19  Substitute Bill No. 7293 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07293-
R01-HB.docx }   
2 of 3 
 
a report on the nature and status of such proposals to the joint 20 
standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of 21 
matters relating to the environment and energy and technology and to 22 
the joint standing committee on legislative management. The joint 23 
standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of 24 
matters relating to the environment and energy and technology may 25 
hold a joint public hearing on such report not later than thirty days 26 
after receipt of such report. The commissioner, or the commissioner's 27 
designee, shall testify at any such public hearing and receive 28 
comments from the members of said committees concerning such 29 
proposals. [On or before December 31, 2017, the] Notwithstanding any 30 
other provision of the general statutes, the Commissioner of Energy 31 
and Environmental Protection may select one such final proposal and 32 
direct the Materials Innovation and Recycling Authority to enter into 33 
an agreement with the applicable respondent for the redevelopment of 34 
the Connecticut Solid Waste Management System Project. In selecting 35 
such final proposal, the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental 36 
Protection shall consider the following factors: (1) Whether the 37 
proposal is consistent with the strategies developed pursuant to 38 
section 22a-241a, (2) whether the proposal is consistent with the goals 39 
of the state-wide solid waste management plan adopted in accordance 40 
with section 22a-228, (3) whether the proposal is in the best interest of 41 
the municipalities under contract with the Materials Innovation and 42 
Recycling Authority, including, but not limited to, the maintenance or 43 
reduction of current tipping fees for contracted waste, (4) the level of 44 
investment proposed by the respondent, (5) any potential positive 45 
impacts on the state's economic development, (6) public comments 46 
received on the feasibility studies, and (7) any other factor consistent 47 
with the purpose of this section that the Commissioner of Energy and 48 
Environmental Protection deems relevant to the redevelopment of the 49 
Connecticut Solid Waste System Project. The selection of a final 50 
proposal by the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection, 51 
in consultation with the Materials Innovation and Recycling Authority, 52 
shall not be construed as a legislative mandate as it relates to the 53 
Materials Innovation and Recycling Authority's ability to obligate 54  Substitute Bill No. 7293 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07293-
R01-HB.docx }   
3 of 3 
 
municipal customers to remain under contract or to enter into any 55 
contract with the applicable respondent. 56 
(b) Not later than May 15, 2019, the Materials Innovation and 57 
Recycling Authority shall submit the terms of a preliminary agreement 58 
with the applicable respondent that was negotiated in accordance with 59 
subsection (a) of this section to the joint standing committee of the 60 
General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to the 61 
environment, the Governor, the Commissioner of Energy and 62 
Environmental Protection and each municipality served by the 63 
Connecticut Solid Waste System Project. Such terms shall be posted on 64 
the Internet web site of the authority. The commissioner and the 65 
authority shall consult with such municipalities concerning the terms 66 
of such preliminary agreement, including, but not limited to, any 67 
service fees and contract terms that may be applicable to such 68 
municipalities. 69 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage 22a-268g 
 
ENV Joint Favorable Subst.