House | 03/21/2019 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2019 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |