House | 05/14/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Public Act 19-1 | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/22/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 376 | ||
House | 04/22/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Emergency Certification |