Senate | 04/09/2019 | File Number 562 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 274 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 01/30/2019 | Public Hearing 02/04 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
Senate | 01/28/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/18/2019 | Vote to Draft |