Senate | 05/16/2019 | House Calendar Number 606 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8635 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | File Number 795 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 387 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Public Hearing 03/29 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Vote to Draft |