Senate | 05/13/2019 | House Calendar Number 580 | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | File Number 233 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 131 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/28/2019 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |