Senate
|
07/12/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2021
|
Public Act 21-180
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9885
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 439
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
File Number 69
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
House Calendar Number 88
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/03
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|