Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06106 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/25/2021

                             
 
 
Substitute House Bill No. 6106 
 
Public Act No. 21-180 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE PROPERTY TAX EXEMPTION FOR 
CERTAIN RENEWABLE ENERGY SOURCES AND HYDROPOWER 
FACILITIES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subdivision (57) of section 12-81 of the general statutes is 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 
1, 2021, and applicable to assessment years commencing on or after October 1, 
2021): 
(57) (A) (i) Any Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 
16-1, or hydropower facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection 
(a) of section 16-1, installed for the generation of electricity where such 
electricity is intended for private residential use or on a farm, as defined 
in subsection (q) of section 1-1, provided (I) such installation occurs on 
or after October 1, 2007, [and further provided] (II) the estimated annual 
production of such source or facility does not exceed the estimated 
annual load for the location where such source or facility is located, 
where such load and production are estimated as of the date of 
installation of the source or facility as indicated in the written 
application filed pursuant to subparagraph (E) of this subdivision, and 
(III) such installation is for a single family dwelling, a multifamily 
dwelling consisting of two to four units or a farm; [,] (ii) any passive or  Substitute House Bill No. 6106 
 
Public Act No. 21-180 	2 of 5 
 
active solar water or space heating system; [,] or (iii) any geothermal 
energy resource. In the case of clause (i) of this subparagraph, the 
utilization of or participation in any net metering or tariff policy or 
program implemented by the state or ownership of such source or 
facility by a party other than the owner of the real property upon which 
such source or facility is installed shall not disqualify such source or 
facility from exemption pursuant to this section. In the case of clause (ii) 
or (iii) of this subparagraph, such exemption shall apply only to the 
amount by which the assessed valuation of the real property equipped 
with such system or resource exceeds the assessed valuation of such real 
property equipped with the conventional portion of the system or 
resource; 
(B) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2013, 
any Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 16-1, 
hydropower facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection (a) of 
section 16-1, or solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy source, 
installed for generation or displacement of energy, provided (i) such 
installation occurs on or after January 1, 2010, (ii) such installation is for 
commercial or industrial purposes, (iii) the nameplate capacity of such 
source or facility does not exceed the load for the location where such 
generation or displacement is located, and (iv) such source or facility is 
located in a distressed municipality, as defined in section 32-9p, with a 
population between one hundred twenty-five thousand and one 
hundred thirty-five thousand; 
(C) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2013, 
any municipality may, upon approval by its legislative body or in any 
town in which the legislative body is a town meeting, by the board of 
selectmen, abate up to one hundred per cent of property tax for any 
Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 16-1, hydropower 
facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection (a) of section 16-1, or 
solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy source, installed for  Substitute House Bill No. 6106 
 
Public Act No. 21-180 	3 of 5 
 
generation or displacement of energy, provided (i) such installation 
occurs between January 1, 2010, and December 31, 2013, (ii) such 
installation is for commercial or industrial purposes, (iii) the nameplate 
capacity of such source or facility does not exceed the load for the 
location where such generation or displacement is located, and (iv) such 
source or facility is not located in a municipality described in 
subparagraph (B) of this subdivision; 
(D) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2014, 
any (i) Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 16-1, (ii) 
hydropower facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection (a) of 
section 16-1, or (iii) solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy 
source, installed for generation or displacement of energy, provided (I) 
such installation occurs on or after January 1, 2014, (II) is for commercial 
or industrial purposes, (III) the nameplate capacity of such source or 
facility does not exceed the load for the location where such generation 
or displacement is located or the aggregated load of the beneficial 
accounts for any Class I renewable energy source participating in virtual 
net metering pursuant to section 16-244u, and (IV) in the case of clause 
(iii) of this subparagraph, such exemption shall apply only to the 
amount by which the assessed valuation of the real property equipped 
with such source exceeds the assessed valuation of such real property 
equipped with the conventional portion of the source; 
(E) Any person claiming the exemption provided in this subdivision 
for any assessment year shall, on or before the first day of November in 
such assessment year, file with the assessor or board of assessors in the 
town in which such hydropower facility, Class I renewable energy 
source, solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy source or passive 
or active solar water or space heating system or geothermal energy 
resource is located, a written application claiming such exemption. Such 
application shall be made on a form prepared for such purpose by the 
Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management, in consultation with  Substitute House Bill No. 6106 
 
Public Act No. 21-180 	4 of 5 
 
the Connecticut Association of Assessing Officers and the Connecticut 
Green Bank established pursuant to section 16-245n, and shall include, 
but not be limited to, a statement of the estimated annual load and 
production of a source or facility described in clause (i) of subparagraph 
(A) of this subdivision as of the date of the installation of such source or 
facility. Said secretary shall make such application available to the 
public on the Internet web site of the Office of Policy and Management. 
Failure to file such application in the manner and form as provided by 
[such assessor or board] the secretary within the time limit prescribed 
shall constitute a waiver of the right to such exemption for such 
assessment year. Such application shall not be required for any 
assessment year following that for which the initial application is filed, 
provided if such hydropower facility, Class I renewable energy source, 
solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy source or passive or 
active solar water or space heating system or geothermal energy 
resource is altered in a manner which would require a building permit, 
such alteration shall be deemed a waiver of the right to such exemption 
until a new application, applicable with respect to such altered source, 
is filed and the right to such exemption is established as required 
initially. In the event that a person owns more than one such source or 
facility in a municipality, such person may file a single application 
identifying each source or facility; 
(F) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2015, 
any municipality may, by vote of its legislative body or, in a 
municipality where the legislative body is a town meeting, by vote of 
the board of selectmen, abate up to one hundred per cent of the property 
taxes due for any tax year, for not longer than the term of the power 
purchase agreement, with respect to any Class I renewable energy 
source, as defined in section 16-1, that is the subject of such power 
purchase agreement approved by the Public Utilities Regulatory 
Authority pursuant to section 16a-3f;  Substitute House Bill No. 6106 
 
Public Act No. 21-180 	5 of 5