Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06106 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 10, 2021
Fiscal Note June 3, 2021
Fiscal Note March 17, 2021
Bill January 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 30, 2021
Bill March 17, 2021
Analysis March 17, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 25, 2021