Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06106 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/17/2021

                     
Researcher: JS 	Page 1 	3/17/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6106  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE PROPERTY TAX EXEMPTION FOR 
CERTAIN RENEWABLE ENERGY SOURCES AND 
NONRESIDENTIAL HYDROPOWER FACILITIES. 
 
SUMMARY 
This bill expands the availability of the property tax exemption for 
certain renewable energy facilities. 
For renewable energy facilities installed for commercial and 
industrial uses, the bill (1) extends the tax exemption to facilities 
installed for all nonresidential purposes and (2) increases the size or 
number of facilities eligible to be installed at each location. 
For renewable energy facilities on farms or for private residential 
use, the bill prohibits the disqualification of a facility from the 
exemption because it (1) uses or participates in net metering, a tariff 
policy, or another state program or (2) is owned by someone other 
than the property owner (e.g., leased solar panels). It also limits the 
size or number of installed facilities that are eligible for this exemption 
to those whose estimated annual production does not exceed the 
estimated annual load where the facility is located. 
To claim either exemption, existing law requires taxpayers to file an 
application with the assessor or board of assessors. The bill requires 
the application form to include a statement of the facility’s estimated 
annual load (presumably, the load of the property where the facility is 
located) and production as of its installation date.  
The bill also allows someone owning multiple facilities in the same 
municipality to file a single application identifying each one. Under 
current law, the assessors provide the application form. The bill 
instead requires the Office of Policy and Management (OPM) secretary 
to prepare the form and make it publicly available on the OPM  2021HB-06106-R000069-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JS 	Page 2 	3/17/21 
 
website.  
EFFECTIVE DATE:  October 1, 2021, and applicable to assessment 
years on or after that date. 
FACILITIES FOR NONRESIDENTIAL PURPOSES 
Current law generally exempts from property tax the following 
facilities installed on or after January 1, 2014, for commercial or 
industrial purposes: (1) Class I renewable energy sources (e.g., wind 
and solar) and (2) solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy 
sources. The bill broadens the exemption by applying it to facilities 
installed for nonresidential purposes, rather than just commercial or 
industrial purposes.  
Current law provides this exemption only for facilities with a 
nameplate capacity less than or equal to their location’s load. 
Nameplate capacity is generally the maximum potential output of the 
energy source under ideal conditions. The bill instead makes these 
renewable energy sources eligible for the exemption if their estimated 
annual production does not exceed the estimated annual load for the 
location where they are installed. Because annual production estimates 
would presumably account for performance under actual conditions 
rather than ideal conditions, the bill effectively expands the number or 
size of facilities eligible for the tax exemption (i.e., more or larger 
facilities could be installed without exceeding the location’s estimated 
annual load because estimated annual production would be lower 
than nameplate capacity). 
FACILITIES ON RESIDENTIAL PROPERTY AND FARMS 
Current law exempts from property tax Class I renewable energy 
sources (e.g., wind and solar) installed on or after October 1, 2007, for 
private residential use or for use on a farm. The bill prohibits these 
facilities from being disqualified from the exemption because they (1) 
participate in net metering, tariff policies, or other state programs or 
(2) are owned by a party other than the owner of the property where 
the facility is installed (e.g., leased solar panels). In practice, the 
application of current law to leased facilities varies across  2021HB-06106-R000069-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JS 	Page 3 	3/17/21 
 
municipalities.  
Current law does not cap or limit the size or number of installed 
facilities eligible for this tax exemption. The bill limits the exemption to 
those facilities whose estimated annual production does not exceed the 
estimated annual load where the facility is located. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Planning and Development Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 26 Nay 0 (03/02/2021)