House | 04/13/2021 | File Number 413 | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | House Calendar Number 314 | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
House | 02/04/2021 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |