House | 07/12/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/28/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/28/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/24/2021 | Public Act 21-158 | ||
House | 06/09/2021 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/09/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 372 | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | File Number 226 | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | House Calendar Number 187 | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |