Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06427 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 26, 2021
Fiscal Note March 31, 2021
Bill February 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 6, 2021
Bill March 31, 2021
Analysis March 31, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 24, 2021