House | 06/14/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/08/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/08/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/07/2021 | Special Act 21-8 | ||
House | 06/02/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/02/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 492 | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | File Number 266 | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | House Calendar Number 220 | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |