Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06476 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021
Bill February 17, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 15, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021